VA HB2787 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia voter registration system; security plans and procedures; remedying security risks. Requires the State Board of Elections to promulgate regulations to ensure the security and integrity of the Virginia voter registration system.
Title
Virginia voter registration system; security plans and procedures, remedying security risks.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19105273D |