VA HB2780 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Science, technology, engineering, arts, and mathematics (STEAM) programs; grants. Creates a special fund known as the STEAM Education Fund.
Title
STEAM programs; establishes STEAM Education Fund.
Sponsors
Del. Hala Ayala [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19105269D |