VA HB2778 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Petition for vacatur and expungement of convictions and police and court records of human trafficking victims. Allows any person who was a human trafficking victim at the time of an offense that led to a criminal charge or conviction of certain crimes to petition the court to vacate such conviction and expunge the police and court records related to such conviction or to expunge the police and court records related to such charge. The bill provides that there is a rebuttable presumption that a person's participation in an offense was a result of having been a victim of human trafficking if there is official documentation, defined in the bill, of the petitioner's status as a victim of human trafficking at the time of the offense.
Title
Human trafficking victims; petition for vacatur and expungement of convictions, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19101748D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |