VA HB2777 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Criminal Justice Services; powers and duties; establishment of guidelines for the surrender of firearms. Provides that the Department of Criminal Justice Services shall have the power and duty to develop guidance documents and instructions on the surrender or transfer of firearms by a person who is subject to a family abuse protective order and thus prohibited from knowingly possessing a firearm while the order is in effect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCJS; powers and duties, establishment of guidelines for the surrender of firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19103052D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91102(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback