VA HB2756 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child day programs; licensure exemption. Exempts from licensure any child day program in which child-minding services are offered on the premises of a business for no more than four children under the age of 13 at any given time and for no more than eight hours per day, provided that the parent or guardian of every child receiving care is an employee of the business who is on the premises of the business and can resume responsibility for the child's supervision within 30 minutes upon request.
Title
Child day programs; licensure exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 667 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2756ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2756H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106040D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106040D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103746D |