VA HB275 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Transportation Board; regulations; secondary street acceptance. Requires the regulations adopted by the Commonwealth Transportation Board regarding ensuring connectivity of highway and pedestrian networks with transportation networks during secondary street acceptance to include flexibility to limit the number of such connections to adjacent property or highway networks. The bill requires the Department of Transportation to convene a stakeholder advisory group to develop and provide recommended amendments to such regulations. Commonwealth Transportation Board; regulations; secondary street acceptance. Requires the regulations adopted by the Commonwealth Transportation Board regarding ensuring connectivity of highway and pedestrian networks with transportation networks during secondary street acceptance to include flexibility to limit the number of such connections to adjacent property or highway networks. The bill requires the Department of Transportation to convene a stakeholder advisory group to develop and provide recommended amendments to such regulations.
Title
Secondary street acceptance; Commonwealth Transportation Board regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 425 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB275ER) |
2022-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 22101566D-E |
2022-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB275E |
2022-02-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101566D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Transportation
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Transportation