VA HB2738 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; acquisition of rights-of-way for economic development sites. Authorizes a public utility providing water, sewer, electric, or natural gas service to propose an Economic Development Program (Program) under which it may acquire utility right-of-way for one or more qualified economic development sites. A proposal for a Program is required to include an analysis of how acquiring the rights-of-way will enhance the Commonwealth's infrastructure and promote the Commonwealth's competitive business environment by improving the readiness of a qualified economic development site. The measure establishes criteria for the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority to certify that an industrial site is a qualified economic development site. The State Corporation Commission (SCC) is authorized to approve a proposal for a Program that satisfies certain conditions, including findings that (i) implementation of the Program will provide significant economic development benefits that might not otherwise be attained absent its approval and (ii) the Program is designed only to acquire utility rights-of-way to a qualified economic development site and not to provide service to other customers or potential customers. A utility's capital investment is capped at one percent of gross plant investment in the aggregate of all of the utility's Programs and at $5 million for any specific qualified economic development site. This bill is identical to SB 1695.
Title
Public utilities; acquisition of rights-of-way for economic development sites.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] |
Del. Steven Landes [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 494 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2738ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 13-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2738H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105626D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105626D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104165D |