VA HB2734 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Criminal Justice Services; school resource officers; school administrators; training. Directs the Department of Criminal Justice Services (Department) to establish compulsory minimum training standards for law-enforcement officers serving as school resource officers that shall include (i) relevant state and federal laws; (ii) school and personal liability issues; (iii) security awareness in the school environment; (iv) mediation and conflict resolution, including de-escalation techniques; (v) disaster and emergency response; (vi) awareness of cultural diversity and implicit bias; (vii) working with students with disabilities, behavioral health or substance abuse disorders, or trauma experiences; and (viii) student behavioral dynamics, including child and adolescent development. The bill also directs the Department, in consultation with the Department of Education and the Virginia State Crime Commission, to include such similar minimum training standards for school security officers. The bill requires each school board to ensure that every public school employs at least one school administrator who has attended school safety training conducted by the Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety in school safety, anti-bullying tactics, and effective identification of students who may be at risk for violent behavior and are in need of special services or assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCJS; training standards for school resource officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N)
2019-01-25HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 19104134D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221279.8(n/a)See Bill Text
91102(n/a)See Bill Text
91114.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback