VA HB2724 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Statewide Building Code; rental inspection districts; inspection of residential rental dwelling units. Permits a local building department in a locality that has established a rental inspection district to choose to delay the initial inspection of dwelling units until the first time the units become vacant on or after the establishment of the district, unless an earlier inspection is requested by the owner or a tenant.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; rental inspection districts, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104686D |