VA HB270 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sale of dog or cat not obtained from releasing agency or animal rescue; prohibition. Authorizes localities to adopt ordinances prohibiting the sale in a pet shop of any dog or cat that was not obtained from a Virginia releasing agency or a nonprofit animal rescue organization. The bill provides that a violation of the ordinance shall be a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Sale of dog or cat not obtained from releasing agency or animal rescue; prohibition.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102649D |