VA HB2682 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; deadline for returning absentee ballot. Provides that any absentee ballot that is returned to the general registrar after the closing of the polls on election day but before noon on the third day after the election and postmarked on or before the date of the election shall be counted if the voter is found entitled to vote. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Absentee voting; deadline for returning absentee ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104578D |