VA HB2678 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unlawful dissemination or sale of images of another person; penalty. Provides, for the purposes of the prohibition against the unlawful dissemination or sale of certain images of another person, that "another person" includes a person whose image was used in creating, adapting, or modifying a videographic or still image with the intent to depict an actual person and who is recognizable as an actual person by the person's face, likeness, or other distinguishing characteristic. This bill is identical to SB 1736.
Title
Unlawful dissemination or sale of images of another; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 490 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2678ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Ebbin, Stuart, Stanley |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Delegates: Simon, Bell, Robert B., Collins |
2019-02-20 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-20 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 19106817D-S1 (1-Y 96-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2678S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106817D-S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106817D-S1 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2678H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106214D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106214D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103868D |