VA HB2656 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0489)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Law-Enforcement Officers Procedural Guarantee Act; definition of law-enforcement officer. Amends the definition of "law-enforcement officer" under the Law-Enforcement Officers Procedural Guarantee Act (the Act) to include those persons who are nonprobationary officers of the police department, bureau, or force of any political subdivision or the campus police department of any public institution of higher education of the Commonwealth where such department, bureau, or force has three or more law-enforcement officers. Currently, such department, bureau, or force is required to have at least 10 law-enforcement officers for purposes of this definition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-Enforcement Officers Procedural Guarantee Act; amends definition of law-enforcement officer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0489)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 489 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2656ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateRereferred to General Laws and Technology
2019-02-12SenateRereferred from Fin. (12-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 19103856D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91500(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2656
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2656+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2656ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0489+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0207V0006+HB2656
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0020+HB2656
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2332+HB2656
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0306+HB2656
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0156+HB2656
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2656+HB2656
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB2656+HB2656

Bill Comments

feedback