VA HB2650 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Custody and visitation arrangements; best interests of the child; domestic abuse; child abuse. Requires the court to consider domestic abuse, defined in the bill, and child abuse in addition to, under current law, family abuse and sexual abuse when determining the best interests of the child for the purposes of custody and visitation arrangements.
Title
Custody and visitation arrangements; best interests of the child, domestic abuse, child abuse.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19101247D |