VA HB2647 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Condominium Act; meetings of unit owners' associations; proxy voting. Provides that any proxy shall be void if not signed by or on behalf of the unit owner. The bill also provides that if the unit owner is more than one person, any such unit owner may object to the proxy at or prior to a meeting of the unit owners' association, whereupon the proxy shall be deemed revoked. Under current law, the proxy of any person is void if not signed by a person having authority, at the time of the execution thereof, to execute deeds on behalf of that person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominium Act; meetings of unit owners' associations, proxy voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 367 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2647ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2647H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105784D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105784D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 19101641D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2647
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2647+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2647H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2647ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0367+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1102V0022+HB2647
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0086+HB2647
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2177+HB2647
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2251+HB2647
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0138+HB2647
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2647+HB2647
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0659HB2647+HB2647

Bill Comments

feedback