VA HB2622 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0434)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0434)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Removal of a child; names and contact information of persons with a legitimate interest. Provides that, in any proceeding in which a child is removed from his home, the court may order the parents or guardians of such child to provide the names and contact information for all persons with a legitimate interest to the local department of social services.
Title
Removal of a child; names and contact information of relatives or other interested individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0434) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 434 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2622ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Peake, Deeds, Stanley |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Austin, Kilgore, Bourne |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: REJECTED #2 (2-Y 96-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (2-Y 96-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Reconsideration of Senate amendment rejected by House |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 98-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2622H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105454D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105454D-H1 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103892D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 229.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 252 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 277.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 277.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 283 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |