VA HB2615 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Capital murder; law-enforcement officers and fire marshals; mandatory minimum. Provides that any person convicted of capital murder of a law-enforcement officer or certain other public safety officials who was 18 years of age or older at the time of the offense shall be sentenced to no less than a mandatory minimum term of confinement for life. This bill is identical to SB 1501.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital murder; punishment if against law-enforcement officers and fire marshals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 835 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2615ER2)
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 4-N)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-21HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2615ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2615H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106312D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106312D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 19103652D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18231(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2615
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2615+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2615H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2615ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2615ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0835+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0117+HB2615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0109+HB2615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2400+HB2615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0275+HB2615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB2615+HB2615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0588HB2615+HB2615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3396+HB2615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1177HB2615+HB2615

Bill Comments

feedback