VA HB2611 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative; prohibition on participation by Commonwealth. Prohibits the Governor or any state agency from adopting any regulation establishing a carbon dioxide cap-and-trade program or bringing about the participation by the Commonwealth in a regional market for the trading of carbon dioxide allowances. The bill provides that the Commonwealth shall be allowed to participate in such a cap-and-trade program if the House of Delegates and the Senate of Virginia each adopt a resolution by a two-thirds vote that specifically references and approves the regulatory text proposed for adoption by a state agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative; prohibition on participation by Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto
2019-03-14 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2611ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (20-Y 19-N)
2019-02-13SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-12SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 6-N)
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-29HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N)
2019-01-28HouseEngrossed by House
2019-01-28HousePending question ordered
2019-01-28HouseRead second time
2019-01-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-23HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (12-Y 10-N)
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 19103557D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011184.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2611
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2611+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2611ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0101V0017+HB2611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0011+HB2611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1957+HB2611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0081+HB2611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB2611+HB2611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0581HB2611+HB2611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0592HB2611+HB2611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0593HB2611+HB2611

Bill Comments

feedback