VA HB261 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Localities; regulation of firearms in government buildings. Allows localities to regulate the possession of firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof in, or the carrying of firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof into, any building owned or used by such locality for governmental purposes. Current law prohibits localities from adopting or enforcing any ordinance, resolution, or motion regarding firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof unless expressly authorized by statute.
Title
Localities; regulation of firearms in government buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101844D |