VA HB2570 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Family life education programs; student participation. Prohibits any public elementary or secondary school student from participating in any family life education program without the prior written consent of his parent.
Title
Family life education programs; student participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (50-Y 46-N) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (50-Y 46-N) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 48-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 48-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (50-Y 46-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House (50-Y 46-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Pending question ordered |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101376D |