VA HB2568 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Child Safety Savings Accounts established. Permits the parents of certain children who are victims of bullying, certain crimes, and certain other violent acts to apply to the school division in which the child resides for a one-year, renewable Child Safety Savings Account that consists of an amount that is equivalent to a certain percentage of all applicable annual Standards of Quality per pupil state funds appropriated for public school purposes and apportioned to the resident school division in which the student resides, including the per pupil share of state sales tax funding in basic aid and any state per pupil share of special education funding for which the student is eligible. The bill permits the parent to use the moneys in such account for certain education-related expenses of the student, including tuition, deposits, fees, and required textbooks at a private elementary school or secondary school that is located in the Commonwealth. The bill also contains provisions relating to auditing, rescinding, and reviewing expenses made from such accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Safety Savings Accounts; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Education
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101222D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221222.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221222.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback