VA HB2542 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Temporary delegation of parental or legal custodial powers; child-placing agency. Allows a parent or legal custodian of a minor to delegate to another person by a properly executed power of attorney any powers regarding care, custody, or property of the minor for a period not exceeding 180 days. The bill provides that a parent or legal custodian who is a service member, as defined in the bill, may delegate such powers for a period of longer than 180 days while on active duty service, but specifies that such a period is not to exceed such active duty service plus 30 days. The bill provides that any such power of attorney shall be signed by all persons with authority to make decisions concerning the child, the person to whom powers are delegated under the power of attorney, and a representative of a licensed child-placing agency that assists parents and legal guardians with the process of delegating parental and legal custodial powers of their children. The bill specifies that such licensed child-placing agency will be subject to background checks and must develop and implement written policies for certain services and provide staff and provider training. The bill further requires that any person to whom any such powers are delegated shall comply with background check requirements established by regulations of the Board of Social Services or otherwise provided by law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental or legal custodial powers; delegation of powers, child-placing agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 27-N 1-A) (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 297 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2542ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 27-N 1-A)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House (71-Y 27-N 1-A)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2542H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105682D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105682D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103471D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632100(n/a)See Bill Text
6321715(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2542
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2542+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2542H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2542ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0297+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0038+HB2542
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0062+HB2542
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2104+HB2542
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0243+HB2542
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB2542+HB2542
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0587HB2542+HB2542

Bill Comments

feedback