VA HB253 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0389)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0389)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Offenses requiring registration under the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry Act; unlawful dissemination or sale of images of another. Adds a third or subsequent conviction of unlawful dissemination or sale of images of another to the list of offenses requiring registration under the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry if the offense was committed on or after July 1, 2020. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry Act; offenses requiring registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 12-N) (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 12-N) (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0389) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 389 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB253ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (85-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB253H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108030D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108030D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103884D |