VA HB253 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - Continued to 2015 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - Continued to 2015 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alternative onsite sewage systems; licensure of installers. Removes the requirement for an applicant for licensure as an installer of alternative onsite sewage systems to pass an examination if such applicant demonstrates to the Board for Waterworks and Wastewater Works Operators and Onsite Sewage System Professionals that he has been performing the duties of an alternative onsite sewage system installer for at least eight years within the 12-year period immediately preceding the date of application for licensure. This bill is carried over pursuant to Rule 22 of the House.
Title
Alternative onsite sewage systems; licensure of installers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Continued to 2015 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2014-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned HWI sub: # 3 |
2013-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100495D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB253 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB253+hil |