VA HB2528 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Felony homicide; certain drug offenses; penalty. Provides that a person is guilty of felony homicide, which constitutes second degree murder and is punishable by confinement of not less than five nor more than 40 years, if the underlying felonious act that resulted in the killing of another involved the manufacture, sale, gift, or distribution of a Schedule I or II controlled substance to another and (i) such other person's death results from his use of the controlled substance and (ii) the controlled substance is the proximate cause of his death. The bill provides that venue for a prosecution of this crime shall lie in the locality where the underlying felony occurred, where the use of the controlled substance occurred, or where death occurred. The bill also provides that if a person gave or distributed a Schedule I or II controlled substance only as an accommodation to another individual who is not an inmate in a community correctional facility, local correctional facility, or state correctional facility, or in the custody of an employee thereof, and not with intent to profit thereby from any consideration received or expected nor to induce the recipient of the controlled substance to use or become addicted to or dependent upon such controlled substance, he is guilty of a Class 5 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Felony homicide; certain drug offenses, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 51-N) (Y: 47 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03HouseCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 51-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (47-Y 51-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-26HouseGovernor's substitute printed 19107848D-H1
2019-03-26HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2528ER)
2019-02-23HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (69-Y 30-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate substitute with amendments agreed to by House 19107357D-S2 (69-Y 30-N)
2019-02-21SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB2528S2
2019-02-21SenateAmendments by Senator Obenshain agreed to
2019-02-21SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-21SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19107357D-S2
2019-02-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-21SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19106811D-S1
2019-02-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-21SenateRead third time
2019-02-20SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 19107357D-S2
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106811D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (75-Y 24-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 4-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101005D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18233(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2528
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2528+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2528S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2528S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2528ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2528H1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0118+HB2528
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0116+HB2528
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2483+HB2528
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0256+HB2528
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0366+HB2528
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2528+HB2528
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0962HB2528+HB2528
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3256+HB2528
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3394+HB2528

Bill Comments

feedback