VA HB252 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assistant speech-language pathologists; duties. Allows a person who has met the qualifications prescribed by the Board of Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology (the Board) to practice as an assistant speech-language pathologist in accordance with regulations of the Board and to perform limited duties that are otherwise restricted to the practice of a speech-language pathologist under the supervision and direction of a licensed speech-language pathologist. The bill also requires the Board to review the need for and impact of licensure or certification of assistant speech-language pathologists and report its findings to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by November 1, 2016.
Title
Assistant speech-language pathologists; duties, report.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Gordon Helsel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 77 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB252ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB252H2 |
2016-02-03 | House | Substitute by Delegate Kory agreed to 16105097D-H2 |
2016-02-03 | House | Committee substitute rejected 16104522D-H1 |
2016-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-03 | House | Floor substitute printed 16105097D-H2 (Kory) |
2016-02-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104522D-H1 |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102536D |