VA HB2502 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Measurement standard for oysters. Provides that oysters in the shell may be bought or sold by (i) one-half bushel or one bushel metallic containers or (ii) a container of not less than 2,800 cubic inches and not more than 3,000 cubic inches the make and model of which has been approved by the Virginia Marine Resources Commission. Current law prohibits buying or selling oysters in the shell by any measure other than metallic circular tubs with specific statutory dimensions.
Title
Oysters; measurement standard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 627 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2502ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-31 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Printed as engrossed 11100893D-E | |
2011-01-28 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2502E | |
2011-01-28 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-21 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11100893D |