VA HB25 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Earned sentence credits; possession of child pornography. Excludes a first offense for the crime of possession of child pornography from the crimes that will eligible for enhanced sentencing credits effective July 1, 2022.
Title
Earned sentence credits; possession of child pornography.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 32-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 32-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (68-Y 32-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (68-Y 32-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 5-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-12-28 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-12-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100808D |