VA HB25 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Obsolete provisions; regulation of public service companies. Updates a citation to the federal Public Utility Holding Company Act. The bill also removes an obsolete reference to repealed sections of the Code of Virginia that pertained to express companies. The bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Public service companies; updates citation to federal Public Utility Holding Company Act, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192) | |
2014-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 192 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB25ER) |
2014-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-14 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-11-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-11-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100487D |