VA HB249 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hemp products; regulation; labeling. Directs the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt regulations prohibiting the use of the term "CBD" in connection with a hemp product, which current law defines to include any lawful product that contains industrial hemp, including oil containing an industrial hemp extract. The bill provides that such regulations shall authorize the use of the term "H-CBD" or "Hemp CBD" instead. The bill authorizes the Board to adopt further regulations governing the labeling and marketing of hemp products.
Title
Hemp products; regulation, labeling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (1-Y 5-N) (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (1-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100820D |