VA HB2473 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Labor and Industry; workplace poster for veterans benefits and services. Directs the Department of Labor and Industry, in consultation with the Department of Veterans Services, to create a poster describing benefits and services available to veterans and allows employers to request and display such poster in the workplace. The bill enumerates a minimum group of resources the poster shall include, including (i) Department of Veterans Services' programs, contact information, and website address; (ii) substance abuse and mental health treatment resources; (iii) educational, workforce, and training resources; (iv) tax benefits; (v) eligibility for unemployment insurance benefits; (vi) legal services; and (vii) the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs Veterans Crisis Line.
Title
Veterans; workplace poster for veterans benefits and services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23104354D |
2023-01-20 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |