VA HB2465 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Consumer Protection Act; open-end credit Virginia Consumer Protection Act; open-end credit plans. Makes a violation of the requirements applicable to open-end credit plan lending a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act.
Title
Virginia Consumer Protection Act; open-end credit plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Sub-Consumer Lending |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104554D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2465 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2465+hil |