VA HB246 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Fines, restitution, forfeiture, penalties, other costs; criminal and traffic cases; itemized statement. Requires the clerk of the court to provide an itemized statement to any defendant convicted of a traffic infraction or a violation of any criminal law of the Commonwealth or of any political subdivision thereof, or found not innocent in the case of a juvenile, who is sentenced to pay a fine, restitution, forfeiture, or penalty or assessed any other costs in the circuit court or appropriate district court of his county or city at the time such fine, restitution, forfeiture, penalty, or other costs are assessed, or within a reasonable time after assessment. The bill requires the clerk to also provide an updated statement of the outstanding balances of any fines, forfeiture, and penalties, restitution and costs, or payment history upon request of the defendant. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2025. Fines, restitution, forfeiture, penalties, other costs; criminal and traffic cases; itemized statement. Requires the clerk of the court to provide an itemized statement to any defendant convicted of a traffic infraction or a violation of any criminal law of the Commonwealth or of any political subdivision thereof, or found not innocent in the case of a juvenile, who is sentenced to pay a fine, restitution, forfeiture, or penalty or assessed any other costs in the circuit court or appropriate district court of his county or city at the time such fine, restitution, forfeiture, penalty, or other costs are assessed, or within a reasonable time after assessment. The bill requires the clerk to also provide an updated statement of the outstanding balances of any fines, forfeiture, and penalties, restitution and costs, or payment history upon request of the defendant. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2025.
Title
Fines, restitution, forfeiture, penalties, etc.; criminal and traffic cases, itemized statement.
Sponsors
Del. Michael Jones [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Rozia Henson [D] | Del. Marty Martinez [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 17, 2024 | |
2024-04-17 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2024-04-17 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (0-Y 100-N) |
2024-04-08 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB246ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 35-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 24105936D-EH1 |
2024-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB246EH1 |
2024-02-05 | House | Committee amendment from Appropriations agreed to |
2024-02-05 | House | Committee substitute from Courts of Justice agreed to 24105936D-H1 |
2024-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2024-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105936D-H1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102010D |