VA HB2458 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Demolished or dismantled motor vehicles; licensee requirements. Sets out procedures by which licensees and scrap metal processors may demolish or dismantle certain motor vehicles. The provisions of the bill become effective on October 1, 2011.
Title
Demolished or dismantled motor vehicles; licensee requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 279 (effective 10/1/11) | |
2011-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2458ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2458H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105107D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105107D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2011-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11104161D |