VA HB2448 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Political contributions; prohibition during procurement process. Clarifies that a person must knowingly violate the prohibition against making or soliciting certain political contributions during the procurement process to the Governor, his political action committee, or the Governor's Secretaries in order to be subject to the civil penalty. The bill also requires that the party receiving a prohibited contribution must return it or, if the contributor cannot be identified, donate it to charity. The bill also provides that in order to trigger the prohibition against political contributions, the bid or proposal must be submitted to an executive branch agency that is directly responsible to the Governor.
Title
Political contributions; prohibition during procurement process, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 624 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2448ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 11103803D-E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2448E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2011-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11103803D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3104.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4376.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |