VA HB2446 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Receipt of mail at courthouse. Requires every county and city courthouse to accept mail at the physical address where the courthouse is located.
Title
County and city courthouses; required to accept mail at the physical address where it is located.
Sponsors
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23104031D |