VA HB2444 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commissioners of the revenue; authorized to examine books and records for sales tax purposes. Authorizes local commissioners of the revenue to examine books and records of dealers and transportation companies. The commissioner of the revenue would be required to report on the results of his examination to the Tax Commissioner, including but not limited to any local use tax that has been incorrectly distributed to a county or city.
Title
Commissioners of the revenue; authorized to examine books and records for sales tax purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Finance | |
2011-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2011-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11104324D |