VA HB2436 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Community Policing Act; data collection and reporting Community Policing Act; data collection and reporting requirement. Prohibits law-enforcement officers and State Police officers from engaging in bias-based profiling, defined in the bill, in the performance of their official duties. The bill requires sheriffs, police forces, and State Police officers to collect certain data pertaining to motor vehicle or investigatory stops to be reported into the Community Policing Reporting Database. The bill requires the Department of State Police to develop and implement such database to collect and analyze motor vehicle and investigatory stops and records of complaints alleging the use of excessive force. The data shall be analyzed to determine the existence and prevalence of the practice of bias-based profiling and the prevalence of complaints alleging the use of excessive force. The bill requires that, each time a law-enforcement officer or State Police officer stops a driver of a motor vehicle, the officer collect the following data: (i) the race, ethnicity, age, and gender of the person stopped; (ii) the reason for the stop; (iii) the location of the stop; (iv) whether a warning, written citation, or summons was issued or whether any persons were arrested; (v) if a warning, written citation, or summons was issued or an arrest was made, the warning provided, violation charged, or crime charged; and (vi) whether the vehicle or any person was searched. Each state and local law-enforcement agency shall also collect the number of complaints the agency receives alleging the use of excessive force. The Superintendent shall annually report the findings and recommendations resulting from the collection, analysis, and interpretation of the data from the Community Policing Reporting Database to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the Attorney General beginning July 1, 2020. The report shall include information regarding any state or local law-enforcement agency that has failed or refused to report the required data to the Department of State Police. A copy of the report shall be provided to each attorney for the Commonwealth of the county or city in which a
Title
Community Policing Act; data collection and reporting requirement.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101032D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1609.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1722.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |