VA HB243 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax subtraction; veteran retirement compensation. Provides an income tax subtraction for the annual retirement compensation received by veterans for their service.
Title
Income tax, state; subtraction for veteran retirement compensation.
Sponsors
Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB80-Cole, M.L.) by voice vote |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102003D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB243 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB243+hil |