VA HB243 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Employees; jury duty. Requires employers, including the Commonwealth and localities, to provide to employees summoned to serve on jury duty the protections set forth in Title 18.2, Crimes and Offenses Generally. With certain exceptions, the employee is entitled to his usual compensation for periods he is excused, though the employer may deduct from such compensation any payments the employee receives for the jury service. The measure creates a private cause of action for an employee who is discharged, demoted, or suspended in violation of these provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jury duty; employees summoned to report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100893D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.7:6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback