VA HB2405 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Real estate with delinquent taxes or liens; appointment of special commissioner. Adds Martinsville to the list of cities with different requirements for the appointment of a special commissioner to execute the necessary deed to convey property with delinquent taxes or liens to the locality in lieu of a sale at public auction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real estate; delinquent taxes or liens, appointment of special commissioner, City of Martinsville.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 8-N) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
2019-02-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 159 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2405ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-12HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N)
2019-02-12HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (93-Y 6-N)
2019-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-08SenatePassed Senate with amendment (35-Y 4-N)
2019-02-08SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-08SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-08SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-08SenateRead third time
2019-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 8-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House (88-Y 8-N)
2019-01-24HousePrinted as engrossed 19102751D-E
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2405E
2019-01-24HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102751D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813970.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2405
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2405+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2405E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2405ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0159+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1002V0004+HB2405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0038+HB2405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1893+HB2405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0283+HB2405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0472HB2405+HB2405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0485HB2405+HB2405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2674+HB2405

Bill Comments

feedback