VA HB2401 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local gas road improvement and Virginia Coalfield Economic Development Authority tax; Coal and Gas Road Improvement Fund uses; sunset. Provides that funds in the Coal and Gas Road Improvement Fund may be used to construct flood mitigation measures that would reduce or prevent flooding of allowable infrastructure and extends from January 1, 2024, to January 1, 2026, the expiration of the local gas road improvement and Virginia Coalfield Economic Development Authority tax. Local gas road improvement and Virginia Coalfield Economic Development Authority tax; Coal and Gas Road Improvement Fund uses; sunset. Provides that funds in the Coal and Gas Road Improvement Fund may be used to construct flood mitigation measures that would reduce or prevent flooding of allowable infrastructure and extends from January 1, 2024, to January 1, 2026, the expiration of the local gas road improvement and Virginia Coalfield Economic Development Authority tax.
Title
Coal and Gas Road Improvement Fund; funds may be used to construct flood mitigation measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 224 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2401ER) |
2023-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 23106746D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2401S1 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106746D-S1 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106746D-S1 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23103764D |