VA HB2401 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Public service corporations; statements of government influence spending. Requires each public service corporation to file with the State Corporation Commission an annual statement of government influence spending that discloses each expenditure made by a public service corporation to influence government actions or public policy, including (i) lobbying expenditures, (ii) industry association dues, and (iii) payments made to any person that seeks to influence public policy. The measure requires the Commission to prepare summaries of the statements and to post the summaries and statements of government influence spending on its website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public service corporations; statements of government influence spending.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103357D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback