VA HB2384 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0246)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public schools; tobacco products and nicotine vapor products. Requires each school board to (i) develop and implement a policy to prohibit the use and distribution of tobacco products and nicotine vapor products on a school bus, on school property, or at an on-site or off-site school-sponsored activity and (ii) include in its code of student conduct a prohibition against possessing tobacco products or nicotine vapor products on a school bus, on school property, or at an on-site or off-site school-sponsored activity. Current law only places these requirements on each school board with regard to electronic cigarettes. The bill requires such policy to include adequate provisions for enforcement among students, employees, and visitors, including the enumeration of possible sanctions or disciplinary action consistent with state or federal law, and referrals to resources to help staff and students overcome tobacco addiction. This bill is identical to SB 1295.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public schools; tobacco products and nicotine vapor products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0246)
2019-03-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 246 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2384ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (83-Y 15-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19102388D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2384E
2019-02-04HouseAmendment by Delegate Orrock agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-31HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseReported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102388D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221279.6(n/a)See Bill Text
22179.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2384
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2384+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2384E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2384ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0246+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0023+HB2384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0063+HB2384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2426+HB2384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0241+HB2384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2384+HB2384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2384+HB2384

Bill Comments

feedback