VA HB2383 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Juvenile and domestic relations court; social history report; consideration and waiver. Requires a court, whenever it adjudicates a juvenile delinquent of an act that would be a violent felony offense if committed by an adult, to direct an investigation and social history report of the juvenile to be completed and to consider the results of such report prior to entering disposition. Under current law, such report is at the discretion of the court. The bill also prohibits waiver of such report by an agreement between the Commonwealth and the juvenile and his attorney or other legal representative. The bill continues to allow such waiver of a social history, by such agreement, for misdemeanor offenses or felonies not classified as a violent felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile and domestic relations district court; social history report, consideration and waiver.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102190D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161273(n/a)See Bill Text
161278.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback