VA HB2379 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Highway Safety Improvement Program; surplus funds. Provides that for any fiscal year, beginning in fiscal year 2024, in which there is a surplus, the Governor shall include in his proposed budget an appropriation of 10 percent of such surplus for the Virginia Highway Safety Improvement Program for the purpose of funding projects consistent with the objectives of the Program.
Title
Virginia Highway Safety Improvement Program; use of surplus funds for Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-20 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23104311D |