VA HB2377 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Replacement of concealed handgun permits; biometric changes. Provides that if a valid concealed handgun permit holder presents a written notice of a change of name, height, weight, or gender on a form provided by the Department of State Police to the clerk of the court who issued such permit, then such clerk shall issue a replacement permit specifying the permit holder's new information.
Title
Concealed handgun permits; replacement permits, biometric changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2023-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23103024D |