VA HB2377 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0054)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0054)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax exemption; certain textbooks and other educational materials. Extends the sunset date from July 1, 2017, to July 1, 2022, for the sales and use tax exemption for textbooks and other educational materials that are withdrawn from inventory at book-publishing distribution facilities for free distribution to professors and other individuals who have an educational focus.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption of certain textbooks and other educational materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0054) | |
2017-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 54 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2377ER) |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103903D |