VA HB2368 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
City of Virginia Beach; sports or entertainment project. Grants the City of Virginia Beach certain powers relating to construction of a sports or entertainment project and any related facilities. Among those powers is the authority to (i) issue bonds to construct a sports or entertainment project, (ii) receive state sales and use tax revenue that is attributable to such project, and (iii) use such revenue to repay such bonds. The bill provides that the City of Virginia Beach's entitlement to state sales and use tax revenue shall expire on July 1, 2039. The powers granted by the bill to the City of Virginia Beach are similar to those granted to the Hampton Roads Sports Facility Authority.
Title
Sports or entertainment project; City of Va. Beach granted certain powers relating to construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred from Local Government (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (72-Y 26-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19104205D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2368E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104205D |