VA HB2367 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; delivery permits. Provides that a delivery permittee is only required to collect the taxes due to the Commonwealth and remit any excise taxes monthly to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (the Authority) and any sales taxes to the Department of Taxation for each delivery the permittee makes if such taxes have not already been paid. The bill specifies that delivery permittees must keep records of all deliveries for a period of at least two years and, in addition to current recordkeeping requirements, requires delivery permittees to keep records of the brands of wine and beer delivered and the signatures of the purchasers to whom the wine and beer is delivered. The bill provides that delivery permittees are only required to submit a monthly report to the Authority for any month during which a permittee makes a delivery for which the permittee is required to collect and remit excise taxes due to the Authority. The bill allows deliveries by such permittees to be performed by an independent contractor of the permittee, provided that (i) the permittee has entered into a written agreement with the independent contractor establishing that the permittee shall be vicariously liable for certain administrative violations committed by the independent contractor and (ii) only one individual takes possession of the beer, wine, or farm wine during the course of the delivery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; delivery permittees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2367ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19107235D-S1 (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2367S1
2019-02-19SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19107235D-S1
2019-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 19107235D-S1
2019-02-15SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 19104396D-EH1
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB2367EH1
2019-01-29HouseAmendments by Delegate Knight agreed to
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104396D-H1
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104396D-H1
2019-01-24HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102604D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41204(n/a)See Bill Text
41212.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2367
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2367+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2367H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2367EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2367S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2367ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0016+HB2367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0072+HB2367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2004+HB2367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0105+HB2367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0772HB2367+HB2367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0822HB2367+HB2367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3169+HB2367

Bill Comments

feedback